EP0432798 - Driver circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Yasuhiro c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd., 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Teruyuki c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd., 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90124211.5 | 14.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | JP19890326580 | 15.12.1989 Original published format: JP 32658089 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0432798 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0432798 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432798 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
G09G3/3674 (EP,US);
G09G3/3685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1991/25] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung | [1991/25] | English: | Driver circuit | [1991/25] | French: | Circuit de commande | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0244978 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]); | [A]GB2135099 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [A]GB2188183 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) |