EP0489970 - Method and device for operating electric drives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSG-Schalttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Meisterstrasse 19 D-72336 Balingen / DE | [1992/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sämann, Rudolf Burgstrasse 12 W-7460 Balingen-Ostdorf / DE | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Otte, Peter Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte, Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Otte, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Mollenbachstrasse 37 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90124280.0 | 14.12.1990 | [1992/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489970 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/402 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
D06F37/304 (EP,US);
D06F34/08 (EP,US);
H02P27/026 (EP,US);
D06F2103/24 (EP,US);
D06F2105/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betrieb von elektrischen Antrieben | [1992/25] | English: | Method and device for operating electric drives | [1992/25] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'opération des entraînements électriques | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 17.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/33] | 19.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.01.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4243926 (PHILLIPS CHARLES A); | [X]FR2500234 (ASTRO DYNAMICS INC [US]); | [A]DE3119794 (KAUTT & BUX KG [DE]) | [A] - ELEKTRONIK vol. 24, no. 7, 1975DE Seiten 72 - 74; E. UEBERREITER: "PHASENANSCHNITT- UND SCHWINGUNGSPAKETSTEUERUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNGEN" |