EP0428185 - Receptacle for refuse-collection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/21] | Refuse-collecting system | ||
[1993/31] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schiller, Rolf Linzgaustrasse 31 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | For all designated states Schiller, Rolf Dreiländerring 26 D-88212 Ravensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/21] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/21] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth Seestrasse 42 D-88214 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90124306.3 | 19.09.1986 | [1991/21] | Priority number, date | DE19853533751 | 21.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3533751 | [1991/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0428185 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0428185 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428185 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0428185 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/00, B65F1/16 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
B65F1/1615 (EP);
B65F1/0046 (EP);
B65F1/122 (EP);
B65F3/001 (EP);
B65F2001/1661 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR [1991/36] |
Former [1991/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Mehrkammer-Müllbehälter | [1993/31] | English: | Receptacle for refuse-collection | [1993/31] | French: | Réceptacle pour la collecte des ordures | [1993/31] |
Former [1991/21] | Müllsammelsystem | ||
Former [1991/21] | Refuse-collecting system | ||
Former [1991/21] | Système pour la collecte des ordures | Examination procedure | 16.01.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, GB, IT, NL, SE | 10.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 15.02.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86112945.0 / EP0220483 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.1994
17.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Gebr. Otto KG Siegener Str. 69 D-57205 Kreuztal / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz, Helge B. Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
04.05.1994
17.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Perstorp AB P.O. Box 5000 S-28 480 Perstorp / SE Opponent's representative Görg, Klaus Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.1994
17.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Gebr. Otto KG Siegener Str. 69 D-57205 Kreuztal / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz, Helge B. Cohausz Dawidowicz Hannig & Sozien Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
04.05.1994
17.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Perstorp AB P.O. Box 5000 S-28 480 Perstorp / SE Opponent's representative Görg, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | |||
Former [1994/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.1994
17.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Gebr. Otto KG Siegener Str. 69 D-57205 Kreuztal / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz, Helge B., Dipl.-Ing. Cohausz Hase Dawidowicz & Partner Schumannstrasse 97-99 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
04.05.1994
17.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Perstorp AB P.O. Box 5000 S-28 480 Perstorp / SE Opponent's representative Görg, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 08.06.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.10.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.07.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.08.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.08.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.06.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.10.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 27.09.1995 | Appeal received No. T0739/95 | 28.12.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.06.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 26.06.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.07.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.02.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.1991 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.1991 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.1991 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.1991 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1067579 (SCHNEIDER WERKE G M B H); | [A]FR1304674 ; | [A]US3127052 ; | [A]US3720346 (CYPHER D); | [AD]FR2336320 (DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]FR2364636 (HROVAT HORST [AT]); | [A]DE8431199U |