Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0742837 | Global Dossier | 10.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4004451 | 14.02.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0442093 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1993 | B1 | EP0442093 | 21.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4004451 | 14.02.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4004451 | 22.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4004451 | 14.02.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59002751D1 | 21.10.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4004451 | 14.02.1990 |