EP0455881 - Joint structure for connecting a driving steerable wheel hub to an axle, particularly for agricultural tractors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRARO S.p.A. Via Olmo, 37 I-35011 Campodarsego (Padova) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states CARRARO S.P.A. Via Olmo, 37 I-35011 Campodarsego (Padova) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabris Armando Via Caltana, 59 I-35011 Campodarsego / IT | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet 9 35131 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Berchet, 9 I-35131 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 90124425.1 | 17.12.1990 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | IT19900041595 | 11.05.1990 Original published format: IT 4159590 | [1991/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455881 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455881 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/30 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
B60K17/306 (EP,US);
F16B2200/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/46] | Title | German: | Verbindung einer angetriebenen lenkbaren Radnabe mit einer Achse, insbesondere für Landwirtschaft | [1991/46] | English: | Joint structure for connecting a driving steerable wheel hub to an axle, particularly for agricultural tractors | [1991/46] | French: | Assemblage pour joindre un moyeu de roue entraînable et dirigeable à un essieu, notamment pour l'agriculture | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.1993 | BE | 27.10.1993 | CH | 27.10.1993 | DK | 27.10.1993 | ES | 27.10.1993 | GR | 27.10.1993 | LI | 27.10.1993 | NL | 27.10.1993 | SE | 27.10.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 27.10.1993 | |
BE | 27.10.1993 | ||
CH | 27.10.1993 | ||
DK | 27.10.1993 | ||
GR | 27.10.1993 | ||
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
NL | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
LU | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 27.10.1993 | |
BE | 27.10.1993 | ||
CH | 27.10.1993 | ||
DK | 27.10.1993 | ||
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
NL | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | AT | 27.10.1993 | |
BE | 27.10.1993 | ||
CH | 27.10.1993 | ||
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
NL | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/38] | AT | 27.10.1993 | |
BE | 27.10.1993 | ||
CH | 27.10.1993 | ||
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 27.10.1993 | |
CH | 27.10.1993 | ||
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/27] | CH | 27.10.1993 | |
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 27.10.1993 | |
LI | 27.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1537966 (DANA CORP); | [A]DE2922660 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN); | [A]GB2155414 (GKN AXLES); | [A]US4801178 (SASA NAOMICHI [JP]); | [A]US4807939 (SASA NAOMICHI [JP]) |