EP0424993 - Heat transfer sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON INSATSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Kaga-Cho 1-Chome Ichigaya Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [1991/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizobuchi, Akira 1-20-2 Nakaochiai Shinjuki-Ku, Tokyo-To / JP | 02 /
Hida, Yoshiaki 2-203, Shintamagawa Heim 1048-1, Nakanoshima Tama-Ku, Kawasaki-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | 03 /
Umise, Shigeki 206, Kasumigaseki Village 444-3, Kamihirose Sayama-Shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Kyoichi 7-29-5 Sagamidai Sagamihara-Shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Takahashi, Kyohei 4-11-2-112 Minamidai Sagamihara-Shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/52] |
Former [1991/18] | 01 /
Mizobuchi, Akira 1-20-2 Nakaochiai Shinjuki-Ku, Tokyo-To / JP | ||
02 /
Hida, Yoshiaki 3-20-8-402 Minami Ooi Shinagawa-Ku, Tokyo-To / JP | |||
03 /
Umise, Shigeki, C/o Dai Nippon Insatsu K. K. Oji Wakatake Ryo, 2-20-1, Akabane Minami Kita-ku, Tokyo-To / JP | |||
04 /
Yamamoto, Kyoichi 7-29-5 Sagamidai Sagamihara-Shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Takahashi, Kyohei 4-11-2-112 Minamidai Sagamihara-Shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al BROOKES AND MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90124545.6 | 19.08.1985 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | JP19840172998 | 20.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17299884 | JP19840172999 | 20.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17299984 | JP19850099378 | 10.05.1985 Original published format: JP 9937885 | [1991/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0424993 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424993 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/38 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/423 (EP,US);
B41M5/426 (EP,US);
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B41M5/443 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31565 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31768 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31801 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/18] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliche Übertragungsschicht | [1991/18] | English: | Heat transfer sheet | [1991/18] | French: | Feuille pour transfert thermique | [1991/18] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 14.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85305892.3 / EP0173532 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58155994 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 279 (M-262)(1424) 13 December 1983, & JP-A-58 155994 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 16 September 1983,, & JP58155994 A 19830916 |