blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0433994

EP0433994 - Scaffolding platform [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.1996
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KAUFMANN HOLZBAUWERK Gesellschaft m.b.H.
A-6870 Reuthe/Bregenzerwald / AT
[1994/41]
Former [1991/26]For all designated states
HOLZBAUWERK KAUFMANN Gesellschaft m.b.H.
A-6870 Reuthe/Bregenzerwald / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Lehner, Peter
Ob de Mur 22
8173 Riedt-Neerach / CH
[1991/26]
Representative(s)Hefel, Herbert
Egelseestrasse 65a
6800 Feldkirch-Tosters / AT
[N/P]
Former [1991/26]Hefel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing.
Egelseestrasse 65a
A-6800 Feldkirch-Tosters / AT
Application number, filing date90124606.618.12.1990
[1991/26]
Priority number, dateCH1989000460721.12.1989         Original published format: CH 460789
[1991/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0433994
Date:26.06.1991
Language:DE
[1991/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0433994
Date:14.08.1991
Language:DE
[1991/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0433994
Date:01.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1991
ClassificationIPC:E04G1/15, E04G9/02
[1991/37]
CPC:
E04G1/151 (EP)
Former IPC [1991/26]E04G1/15
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1991/26]
TitleGerman:Gerüstbrett[1991/26]
English:Scaffolding platform[1991/26]
French:Plate-forme d'échafaudage[1991/26]
Examination procedure13.01.1992Examination requested  [1992/11]
03.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.08.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1994Fee for grant paid
19.10.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE01.03.1995
IT01.03.1995
NL01.03.1995
SE01.06.1995
[2003/11]
Former [1999/42]BE01.03.1995
IT01.03.1995
SE01.06.1995
Former [1996/04]BE01.03.1995
SE01.06.1995
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2101671  ;
 [A]DE2946219  (HEGGENSTALLER ANTON HOLZIND [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.