EP0447665 - Method for the removal of labels and sheet cuts off containers, in particular off bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS ETI-TEC Maschinenbau GmbH Feldheider Strasse 45 40699 Erkrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states KHS ETI-TEC MASCHINENBAU GmbH Feldheider Strasse 45 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchholz, Rainer Brinellstrasse 27 W-4000 Düsseldorf 12 / DE | 02 /
Zodrow, Rudolf Lichtstrasse 37 W-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | [1991/39] | Application number, filing date | 90125145.4 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | DE19904007958 | 13.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4007958 | [1991/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447665 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447665 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/32, // B08B101/08 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
B08B9/083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/39] | B08B9/32, // B08B101:08 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von auf Behältern, insbesondere Flaschen haftenden Etiketten und Folienzuschnitten | [1991/39] | English: | Method for the removal of labels and sheet cuts off containers, in particular off bottles | [1991/39] | French: | Dispositif pour enlever des étiquettes et des découpes de feuille de conteneurs, en particulier de bouteilles | [1991/39] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1824993 (HEROLD JAMES L, et al); | [X]DE2403085 (OBMANN GEORG); | [X]DE2460175 (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT MASCHF); | [A]DE2806080 (GEORG OBMANN POLYTECHNIK DIEBU) |