EP0435217 - Embedded Bragg grating pumped lasers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leonberger, Frederick John 417 Stanley Drive Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 02 /
Glenn, William Henry 41 Marjorie Lane Vernon, CT 06066 / US | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90125232.0 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | US19890457118 | 26.12.1989 Original published format: US 457118 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435217 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435217 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435217 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H01S3/094 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
H01S3/06704 (EP);
H01S3/0675 (EP);
H01S3/06737 (EP);
H01S3/08022 (EP);
H01S3/08086 (EP);
H01S3/094007 (EP);
H01S3/094019 (EP);
H01S3/094038 (EP);
H01S3/094061 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/27] | Title | German: | Gepumpte Laser mit eingebetteter Bragg-Gitterstruktur | [1991/27] | English: | Embedded Bragg grating pumped lasers | [1991/27] | French: | Lasers à pompage à réseau de Bragg enterré | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Request for further processing for: | 25.03.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01143380 ; | [A]WO8601303 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. QE-13, no. 4, April 1977, pages 145-152, New York, US; G. EVANS et al.: "Mode coupling and distributed feedback lasers in periodic fiber waveguides" | [A] - TECHNICAL DIGEST OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION 1987 (ECOC '87), vol. III: Post Deadline Papers, pages 89-94; D.N. PAYNE et al.: "Rare-earth doped fibre lasers and amplifiers" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 401 (E-816), 6 September 1989; & JP - A - 01 143 380 (FUJIKURA LTD), 05-06-1989, & JP01143380 A 19890906 | [A] - N.T.I.S. TECHNICAL NOTES, April 1984, page 286, A-K, Springfield, Virginia, US; C.R. CHUBB et al.: "Fabricating grating couplers on optical fibers" | [XP] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 26, no. 21, October 1990, pages 1829-1830, Stevenage, Herts, GB; G.A. BALL et al.: "Nd3+ fibre laser utilising intra-core bragg reflectors" |