EP0438767 - Process for the separation of riboflavin from a fermentation suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faust, Tillmann, Dr. Parkweg 4 W-6714 Weisenheim / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Joachim, Dr. Gartenstrasse 6 W-6717 Hessheim / DE | 03 /
Wellinghoff, Georg, Dr. Friedrichsplatz 8 W-6800 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Goesele, Walter, Dr. Mannheimer Strasse 226e W-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
Martin, Christoph, Dr. Kolpingstrasse 6 W-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 06 /
Grimmer, Johannes Duererstrasse 12 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1991/31] | Application number, filing date | 90125316.1 | 22.12.1990 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | DE19904002066 | 25.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4002066 | [1991/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438767 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438767 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438767 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12P25/00 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
C12P25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1991/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung von Riboflavin aus Fermentationssuspensionen | [1991/31] | English: | Process for the separation of riboflavin from a fermentation suspension | [1991/31] | French: | Procédé de séparation de riboflavine d'une suspension de fermentation | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2920592 (MERCK & CO INC); | [A]EP0341433 (FLOTTWEG GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE1925001 (PENNWALT CORP) |