Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0728751B | Global Dossier | 05.04.1995 | B2 | JPH057495 | 19.01.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4002066 | 25.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0438767 | Global Dossier | 05.07.1995 | B1 | EP0438767 | 04.12.1991 | A3 | EP0438767 | 31.07.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4002066 | 25.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2034853 | 20.03.2001 | C | CA2034853 | 26.07.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4002066 | 25.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1029969C | 11.10.1995 | C | CN1053612 | 07.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4002066 | 25.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4002066 | 01.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4002066 | 25.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59009375D1 | 10.08.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4002066 | 25.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU1836427 | 23.08.1993 | C | Priority number | Date | DE4002066 | 25.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5169759 | 08.12.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4002066 | 25.01.1990 |