EP0429099 - Pressure sensitive adhesive on the basis of radiation-curable polyesters containing (meth)acryl-groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Hans, Dr. Im Korresgarten 68 W-5204 Lohmar / DE | 02 /
Müller, Hartmut, Dr. Siebengebirgsallee 19 W-5210 Troisdorf / DE | [1991/22] | Application number, filing date | 90125321.1 | 07.05.1986 | [1991/22] | Priority number, date | DE19853516351 | 07.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3516351 | DE19863613082 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3613082 | [1991/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0429099 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/81, C08G18/42, C09J175/16, C08F283/01, C08G63/42, C08G63/66, C08G63/46, C08G63/91 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
C09J167/07 (EP);
C08G18/42 (EP);
C08G18/4291 (EP);
C08G18/8116 (EP);
C08G18/8175 (EP);
C08G63/42 (EP);
C08G63/46 (EP);
C08G63/66 (EP);
C08G63/676 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/8175, C08G18/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | Haftklebstoff auf der Basis von strahlenhärtbaren, (methacrylgruppenhaltigen Polyestern | [1991/22] | English: | Pressure sensitive adhesive on the basis of radiation-curable polyesters containing (meth)acryl-groups | [1991/22] | French: | Colle de contact à base de polyesters durcissables par irradiation contenant des groupes (méth)acryliques | [1991/22] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/23] | 12.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86106290.9 / EP0208856 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU479061 ; | [X]US3664861 (OKAMURA SEIZO, et al); | [A]US3673140 (ACKERMAN JOSEPH FRANCIS, et al); | [X]FR2121191 (BASF AG); | [A]FR2139091 (AGFA GEVAERT AG); | [A]FR2324669 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]US4035320 (LAWSON NELSON E); | [X]FR2361450 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0002866 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [A]EP0054105 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]); | [A]EP0089913 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [X]US4451627 (FRISCH JR KURT C [US], et al); | [E]EP0201100 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [E]EP0207257 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) |