EP0442141 - Pharmaceutical preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gericke, Rolf, Dr. Mozartstrasse 18 W-6104 Seeheim / DE | 02 /
Baumgarth, Manfred, Dr. Sachsenstrasse 53 W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Lues, Ingeborg, Dr. Paul-Wagner-Strasse 13 W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Bergmann, Rolf, Dr. Birkenhag 36 W-6101 Reichelsheim / DE | [1991/34] | Application number, filing date | 90125410.2 | 24.12.1990 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | DE19904004268 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4004268 | [1991/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442141 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442141 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/35, A61K45/06, // (A61K31/35, 31:135) | [1991/34] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/35 (EP,KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/35, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/35, A61K31/135 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zubereitung | [1991/34] | English: | Pharmaceutical preparation | [1991/34] | French: | Préparation pharmaceutique | [1991/34] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 04.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0323745 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 107, Nr. 9, 31. August 1987, Seite 41, Zusammenfassung Nr. 70487r, Columbus, Ohio, US; R. KIRSTEN et al.: "Influence of different bisoprolol doses on hemodynamics, plasma catecholamines, platelet aggregation, and alpha2- and beta-receptors in hypertensive patients", & J. CARDIOVASC. PHARMACOL. 1986, 8(Suppl. 11). S113-S121 |