EP0450191 - Transducer arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235 28305 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235 D-28305 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH D-28305 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states KRUPP ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH Postfach 44 85 45 Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235 D-2800 Bremen 44 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meuser, Wilfried, Dipl.-Ing. Am Lehester Deich 51 W-2800 Bremen 33 / DE | 02 /
Loges, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Am Grossen Moordamm 1C W-2800 Bremen 33 / DE | 03 /
Reipschläger, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Osterdeich 146a W-2800 Bremen 1 / DE | [1991/41] | Application number, filing date | 90125415.1 | 24.12.1990 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | DE19904010502 | 02.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4010502 | [1991/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450191 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450191 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450191 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/22, H01Q1/04 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
H01Q1/04 (EP);
H01Q21/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | Wandleranordnung | [1991/41] | English: | Transducer arrangement | [1991/41] | French: | Arrangement de transducteurs | [1991/41] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.05.1995 | SE | 24.08.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.05.1995 | |
SE | 24.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 24.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4580141 (GUTLEBER FRANK S [US]); | [AP]DE3839945 (TELEFUNKEN SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) | [A] - R.E.WILLEY, '"SUBARRAY ANALYSIS", RADC-TN-60-248; AN/FPS-46 (XW-1); AD No.248463', 30. September 1960, ROME AIR DEVELOPMENT CENTER US AIR FORCE, NEW YORK, US. |