EP0459031 - Pressure control valve for the carter ventilation of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 409 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09 D-71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Heinz Comburgweg 4 W-7148 Remseck 3 / DE | 02 /
Schnabel, Werner Bietigheimer Strasse 11 W-7149 Freiberg / DE | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/49] | Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09 D-71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90125471.4 | 24.12.1990 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | DE19904017074 | 26.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4017074 | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459031 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459031 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/00, F01M11/04, F01M11/12 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
F01M13/023 (EP,US);
F01M11/04 (EP,US);
F01M11/12 (EP,US);
F01M2011/0491 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | Druckregelventil für die Kurbelgehäuseentlüftung an einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1991/49] | English: | Pressure control valve for the carter ventilation of an internal combustion engine | [1991/49] | French: | Soupape de réglage de pression pour la ventilation de carter d'un moteur à combustion interne | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 05.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2407178 (ROOS DELMAR G); | [A]US2757647 (KISHLINE FLOYD F); | [A]DE2702621 (FORD WERKE AG) |