EP0437842 - Electrode for electrochemical reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.09.1993 [1993/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vom Bauer, Hans (verstorben) / DE | 02 /
Dapperheld, Steffen, Dr. Im Birkenfeld 28 W-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 03 /
Kretschmann, Klaus Berliner Strasse 1 W-6094 Bischofsheim / DE | 04 /
Lindner, Werner Kurhausstrasse 16b W-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 05 /
Rossmeissl, Rudolf Marienbader Strasse 5 W-8851 Mertingen / DE | 06 /
Millauer, Hans, Dr. An den 7 Bäumen 21a W-6236 Eschborn / DE | 07 /
Ullmann, Gerhard Jean-Bareth-Strasse 19 W-6080 Gross-Gerau / DE | [1991/30] | Application number, filing date | 90125634.7 | 28.12.1990 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | DE19904000505 | 10.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4000505 | [1991/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437842 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/03, C25B9/00, H01M4/86 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
C25B11/03 (EP,US);
C25B9/73 (EP,US);
H01M4/8626 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/30] | Title | German: | Elektrode für elektrochemische Reaktionsapparate | [1991/30] | English: | Electrode for electrochemical reactors | [1991/30] | French: | Electrode pour réacteurs électrochimiques | [1991/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.07.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4217401 (PELLEGRI ALBERTO [IT], et al); | [Y]CH645674 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [Y]US3871922 (BOHM HARALD, et al); | [A]FR2487861 (SKLYAROV ALEXANDR [SU]) |