EP0491999 - A sewing machine pressing leg and an adjusting device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Kun-Jung 1F,NO3, Alley 1, Lane 138, Chang An St. Pan Chiao City Taipei Hsien Taiwan / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states Lee, Kun-Jung 1F,NO3, Alley 1, Lane 138, Chang An St. Pan Chiao City Taipei Hsien, Taiwan / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90125746.9 | 28.12.1990 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491999 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D05B29/10, D05B29/12 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
D05B29/12 (EP);
D05B29/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, IT [1992/27] | Title | German: | Stoffdruckerfuss für eine Nähmaschine und eine Einstellvorrichtung dafür | [1992/27] | English: | A sewing machine pressing leg and an adjusting device therefor | [1992/27] | French: | Pied presseur pour une machine à coudre et un dispositif d'ajustage pour ce pied | [1992/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 30.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/01] | 05.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2212822 ; | [A]GB729355 ; | [A]US2948242 ; | [A]GB2034777 ; | [A]GB1297441 ; | [A]GB1297442 ; | [A]US2804037 ; | [A]US3294048 ; | [A]US4278039 ; | [A]US3433192 |