EP0382268 - New amino carboxylic acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIST-BROCADES N.V. Wateringseweg 1 P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | [1990/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verweij, Jan P.J. Blokstraat 13 NL-2313 ES Leiden / NL | 02 /
Hirs, Henri Gerard Julius Obrechtrode 26 NL-2717 DD Zoetermeer / NL | 03 /
Witkamp, Hendrik Adrianus Rommesingel 31 NL-2641 VG Pijnacker / NL | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | Visser-Luirink, Gesina, et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Delft P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | Visser-Luirink, Gesina, Dr., et al c/o GIST-BROCADES N.V., Patents and Trademarks Dept., Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | ||
Former [1990/33] | Huygens, Arthur Victor, Dr. c/o Gist-Brocades N.V. Patents & Trademarks Department Wateringseweg 1 PO Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200031.4 | 04.01.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | EP19890200034 | 06.01.1989 Original published format: EP 89200034 | [1990/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0382268 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0382268 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/18, C07D499/02, C07C251/02 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
C07D499/00 (EP);
C07D501/22 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/33] | Title | German: | Derivate von Aminocarboxylsäure | [1990/33] | English: | New amino carboxylic acid derivatives | [1990/33] | French: | Dérivés d'acides aminocarboxyliques | [1990/33] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 21.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/33] | Request for further processing for: | 07.09.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3821198 (LEE B, et al); | [A]DE2440142 (SQUIBB & SONS INC); | [APD]EP0300546 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) |