EP0437867 - Measuring strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nys, Pierre Herman Potvlietlaan 10 B - 2600 Berchem / BE | [1991/30] | Application number, filing date | 90200144.5 | 19.01.1990 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437867 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437867 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/02, G03B27/72, G03F5/00 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
G03C5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/43] |
Former [1991/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Messstreifen | [1991/30] | English: | Measuring strip | [1991/30] | French: | Bande de mesure | [1991/30] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DK, ES, GR, LU, NL, SE | 12.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 06.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.02.1991 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.1991 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.1991 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.1991 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.09.1995 | FR | 13.09.1995 | IT | 13.09.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 13.09.1995 | |
IT | 13.09.1995 | ||
FR | 09.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | BE | 13.09.1995 | |
FR | 09.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 13.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59064832 ; | [X]DE2426840 (FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT FUER DR); | [X]US4004923 (HENSEL ROY E); | [A]EP0000202 (BRUNNER FELIX); | [A]DE3343386 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3409856 (WERNER GERHARD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 169 (P-292)(1606) 04 August 1984, & JP-A-59 064832 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM) 12 April 1984,, & JP59064832 A 19840412 |