EP0381282 - Method of and apparatus for the image-wise exposure of a lightsensitive medium by means of a number of light valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Océ-Nederland B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CC Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states Océ-Nederland B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 NL-5914 CC Venlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Habets, Antonius Hubertus Maria Victor Hugostraat 8 NL-5924 AJ Venlo / NL | 02 /
Rongen, Josephus Wilhelmus Brechtstraat 47 NL-5924 BX Venlo / NL | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Hanneman, Henri W.A.M., et al Océ-Technologies B.V. Patents & Information St. Urbanusweg 43 P.O. Box 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Hanneman, Henri W.A.M., et al Océ-Nederland B.V. Patents and Information St. Urbanusweg 43 P.O. Box 101 NL-5900 MA Venlo / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200197.3 | 29.01.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | NL19890000238 | 01.02.1989 Original published format: NL 8900238 | [1990/32] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0381282 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381282 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/18 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
H04N1/19505 (EP,US);
H04N1/19515 (EP,US);
H04N1/40025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für bildweise Belichtung einer lichtempfindlichen Vorlage unter Verwendung einer Anzahl von Lichtventilen | [1990/32] | English: | Method of and apparatus for the image-wise exposure of a lightsensitive medium by means of a number of light valves | [1990/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'exposition ligne par ligne d'un matériau sensible à la lumière à l'aide d'un certain nombre de valves optiques | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3433870 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]US4096486 (PFEIFER JOSEF, et al); | [A]EP0172592 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |