EP0385540 - Detection label for an anti-shop-lifting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Oude Winterswijkseweg 7 NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Oude Winterswijkseweg 7 NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hogen Esch, Johannes Harm Lukas Hoge Veld 75 NL-7122 ZN Aalten / NL | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200424.1 | 23.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | NL19890000461 | 24.02.1989 Original published format: NL 8900461 | [1990/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385540 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0385540 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24, E05B73/00 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
E05B73/0017 (EP,US);
G08B13/14 (EP,US);
E05B73/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/36] | Title | German: | Alarmetikett als Diebstahlsicherung für Läden | [1990/36] | English: | Detection label for an anti-shop-lifting system | [1990/36] | French: | Etiquette antivol pour magasins | [1990/36] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.1995 | BE | 03.05.1995 | CH | 03.05.1995 | FR | 03.05.1995 | IT | 03.05.1995 | LI | 03.05.1995 | NL | 03.05.1995 | DE | 04.08.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
NL | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/05] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2180680 (OLESZCZUK ROMUALD, et al); | [X]EP0266294 (ALLEGRANZA RENE) |