EP0386820 - Method and arrangement for probabilistic pitch measuring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/37] | Probabilistic pitch meter | ||
[1993/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beerends, John Gerard, c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200440.7 | 26.02.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | NL19890000520 | 03.03.1989 Original published format: NL 8900520 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386820 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386820 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01H3/08, G10L3/00 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
G01H3/08 (EP);
G10L25/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/37] | Title | German: | Wahrscheinlichkeits-Tonhöhenmessgerät und Verfahren | [1993/20] | English: | Method and arrangement for probabilistic pitch measuring | [1993/20] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de mesure par probabilités d'une intonation | [1993/20] |
Former [1990/37] | Wahrscheinlichkeits-Tonhöhenmessgerät | ||
Former [1990/37] | Probabilistic pitch meter | ||
Former [1990/37] | Dispositif de mesure probabilistique de la hauteur tonale | Examination procedure | 08.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2037129 ; | [A]US4004096 | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 71, no. 6, June 1982, pages 1568-1580, Acoustical Society of America, New York, US; H. DUIFHUIS et al.: "Measurement of pitch in speech: An implementation of Goldstein's theory of pitch perception" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 83, no. 1, January 1988, pages 257-264, Acoustical Society of America, New York, NY, US; D.J. HERMES: "Measurement of pitch by subharmonic summation" |