EP0386847 - Crank mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nishiyama, Osamu 3-9, Nagate-cho 5-chome, Nada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states Nishiyama, Osamu 3-9, Nagate-cho 5-chome, Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Voncken, Bartholomeus Maria Ch., et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Voncken, Bartholomeus Maria Christiaan, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200521.4 | 06.03.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | JP19890055606 | 08.03.1989 Original published format: JP 5560689 | JP19890189797 | 21.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18979789 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0386847 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0386847 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16H21/30, F16H37/12, B62M1/02 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
F16H21/30 (EP);
B62M3/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/37] | F16H21/30, B62M1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/37] | Title | German: | Kurbelmechanismus | [1990/37] | English: | Crank mechanism | [1990/37] | French: | Mécanisme de manivelle | [1990/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2606358 [ ]; | WO8607115 [ ]; | US4236416 [ ] |