EP0378282 - Hard disk drive module and receptacle therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1993 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDON CORPORATION 301 Science Drive Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | [1990/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dalziel, Warren Lewis 15801 Viewfield Monte Sereno, California 95030 / US | 02 /
Deremer, Steven Larry 71 Cathy Lane Scotts Valley, California 95066 / US | 03 /
Dugan, Michael Talmon 7539 E. Inspiration Drive Parker Colorado 80134 / US | 04 /
Flanigan, Charles Dennis 479 Gallen Drive San Jose, California 95123 / US | 05 /
Maiers, Martin John 333 Webster Drive Ben Lomond, California 95005 / US | 06 /
Moriconi, David Philip 9415 Manzanita Avenue Ben Lomond, California 95005 / US | 07 /
Peddle, Charles Ingraham 818 Escalona Drive Santa Cruz California 95060 / US | 08 /
Sehnal, Petr J. 7415 Alpine Road La Honda, California 94020 / US | 09 /
Stark, Glenn Michael 155 Wendell Street Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | 10 /
Stein, Kenneth Matthew 4805 West Fork Ct. San Jose, California 95136 / US | 11 /
Tandon, Sirjang Lal 301 Science Drive Moorpark, California 01311 / US | 12 /
Taylor, Robert Gramps, Jr. 5005 Ironwood Drive Soquel California 95073 / US | 13 /
Yeakle, Gary Rex 2459 Le Bain Drive San Jose, California 95130 / US | [1990/31] |
Former [1990/29] | 01 /
Dalziel, Warren Lewis 15801 Viewfield Monte Sereno, California 95030 / US | ||
02 /
Deremer, Steven Larry 71 Cathy Lane Scotts Valley, California 95066 / US | |||
03 /
Dugan, Michael Talmon 2816 N. Keats Thousand Oaks, California 91360 / US | |||
04 /
Flanigan, Charles Dennis 479 Gallen Drive San Jose, California 95123 / US | |||
05 /
Maiers, Martin John 333 Webster Drive Ben Lomond, California 95005 / US | |||
06 /
Moriconi, David Philip 9415 Manzanita Avenue Ben Lomond, California 95005 / US | |||
07 /
Peddle, Charles Ingraham 1172 Bean Creek Road B1 Scotts Valley, California 95066 / US | |||
08 /
Sehnal, Petr J. 7415 Alpine Road La Honda, California 94020 / US | |||
09 /
Stark, Glenn Michael 155 Wendell Street Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | |||
10 /
Stein, Kenneth Matthew 4805 West Fork Ct. San Jose, California 95136 / US | |||
11 /
Tandon, Sirjang Lal 301 Science Drive Moorpark, California 01311 / US | |||
12 /
Taylor, Robert Gramps, Jr. 142 Frederick Street Santa Cruz, California 95062 / US | |||
13 /
Yeakle, Gary Rex 2459 Le Bain Drive San Jose, California 95130 / US | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1990/29] | Application number, filing date | 90200577.6 | 11.02.1988 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | US19870018499 | 25.02.1987 Original published format: US 18499 | [1990/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0378282 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0378282 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B25/04, G11B33/12, G11B33/02, G11B33/08 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
G11B33/122 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/187 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/184 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/3031 (KR);
G11B33/08 (EP,KR,US);
G11B33/121 (EP,US);
G11B33/124 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/29] | Title | German: | Festplatten-Antriebseinheit und Behälter dafür | [1990/29] | English: | Hard disk drive module and receptacle therefor | [1990/29] | French: | Module de disques durs et réceptacle pour ce module | [1990/29] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/45] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88902313.1 / EP0303670 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4359762 (STOLLORZ HERBERT R); | [A]GB2153130 (NORAND CORP); | [A]EP0204299 (PLUS DEV CORP [US]); | [AP]US4717982 (TORESON JAMES S [US], et al) | [A] - MACHINE DESIGN. vol. 56, no. 5, March 1984, CLEVELAND US pages 144 - 150; LELAND TESCHLER: "RUGED DISK DRIVE FOR HOSTILE ENVIRONEMENTS" | [A] - MACHINE DESIGN. vol. 57, no. 2, January 1985, CLEVELAND US pages 70 - 73; D. T. LILLEY: "PROTECTING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT FROM SHOCK AND VIBRATION" | [A] - MINI MICRO SYSTEMS vol. 17, no. 3, March 1984, DENVER, US pages 245 - 248; D. SUTTON: "REMOVABLE-CARTRIDGE WINCHESTER TRIPLES PERFORMANCE-TO-VOLUME RATIO" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 28, no. 10, March 1986, NEW YORK, US pages 4585 - 4586; "CARRIER FOR HEAD/DISK ASSEMBLY" |