EP0387959 - A method for applying a binding around cheeses, as well as so obtained cheeses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONINKLIJKE NEDERLANDSE ZUIVELBOND FNZ Volmerlaan 7 2288 GD Rijswijk (ZH) / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states KONINKLIJKE NEDERLANDSE ZUIVELBOND FNZ Volmerlaan 7 NL-2288 GD Rijswijk (ZH) / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boersma, Hieronymus Ype Spanjaardslaan 86 NL-8917 AV Leeuwarden / NL | 02 /
Kimenai, Martinus Petrus Tenierstraat 35 NL-7204 CA Zutphen / NL | 03 /
Köllmann, Clemens Johannes Willebrordus Dennelaar 61 NL-5467 JL Veghel / NL | 04 /
Ijkema, Sietze De Gauw 4 NL-9873 RM Gerkesklooster / NL | 05 /
Spoelstra, Tamme Meerkoetstraat 34 NL-9291 BA Kollum / NL | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Ellowicz, Leo, et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Ellowicz, Leo, Drs., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [1990/38] | Elzas, Salomon, Drs. Octrooibureau Polak & Charlouis Laan Copes van Cattenburch 80 NL-2585 GD The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200579.2 | 09.03.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | NL19890000668 | 17.03.1989 Original published format: NL 8900668 | [1990/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387959 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387959 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01J25/16, A01J27/00, A23C19/16 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
A01J25/16 (EP);
A01J27/005 (EP);
A23C19/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1990/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befestigen einer Binde um Käse sowie solchermassen erhaltene Käse | [1990/38] | English: | A method for applying a binding around cheeses, as well as so obtained cheeses | [1990/38] | French: | Procédé pour appliquer un bandage autour de fromages et fromages obtenus par ce procédé | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0063845 ; | [Y]FR1589382 ; | [AD]NL180898B ; | [A]FR1437562 ; | [A]FR1292605 | Examination | NL6703984 |