EP0389043 - Production of modified PE40 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riemen, Mark W. 326 Pheasant Run Drive Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 02 /
Stirdivant, Steven M. 57 Old New Road Warrington, PA 18976 / US | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1993/18] | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1990/39] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr. European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex, CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 90200613.9 | 15.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | US19890327214 | 22.03.1989 Original published format: US 327214 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389043 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C12N15/62, A61K47/48 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61K47/665 (EP);
A61K47/6829 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/21 (EP);
C07K14/485 (EP);
C07K14/495 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Herstellung von modifiziertem PE40 | [1990/39] | English: | Production of modified PE40 | [1990/39] | French: | Production de PE40 modifiée | [1990/39] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 19.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/12] | 30.10.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4545985 (PASTAN IRA [US], et al); | [A]WO8702987 (MURPHY JOHN R [US]); | [AD]EP0261671 (PASTAN IRA H [US], et al) | [AD] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, vol. 81, May 1984, pages 2645-2649; G.L. GRAY et al.: "Cloning, nucleotide sequence, and expression in Escherichia coli of the exotoxin a structural gene of Pseudomonas aeruginosa" | [XP] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 264, no. 24, 25th August 1989, pages 14256-14261, US; C.B. SIEGALL et al.: "Functional analysis of domains II,Ib, and III of Pseudomonas exotoxin" | [XP] - INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 57, no. 7, July 1989, pages 1873-1878, American Society for Microbiology; I.H. MADSHUS et al.: "Effects of eliminating a disulfide bridge within domain II of Pseudomonas aeruginosa exotoxin A" | [XP] - MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 9, no. 7, July 1989, pages 2860-2867; G.M. EDWARDS et al.: "Epidermal growth actor receptor binding 1s affected by structural determinants in the toxin domain of transforming growth factor-alpha-Pseudomonas exotoxin fusion proteins" |