EP0392623 - Sloping roller conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAPISTAN VAN DER LANDE B.V. Vanderlandelaan 2, Postbus 18 NL-5460 AA Veghel / NL | [1990/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Goor, Jakobus Marie Boxhornpad 6 NL-5464 WG Eindhoven / NL | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2009/49] |
Former [1992/26] | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau World Trade Center P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1990/42] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir. Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200860.6 | 09.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | NL19890000878 | 10.04.1989 Original published format: NL 8900878 | [1990/42] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0392623 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392623 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65G13/075, B65G13/12 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
B65G13/12 (EP);
B65G13/075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Geneigter Rollenförderer | [1990/42] | English: | Sloping roller conveyor | [1990/42] | French: | Transporteur à rouleaux incliné | [1990/42] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.06.1992 | BE | 24.06.1992 | CH | 24.06.1992 | DK | 24.06.1992 | ES | 24.06.1992 | FR | 24.06.1992 | GR | 24.06.1992 | IT | 24.06.1992 | LI | 24.06.1992 | SE | 24.06.1992 | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.06.1992 | |
BE | 24.06.1992 | ||
CH | 24.06.1992 | ||
DK | 24.06.1992 | ||
ES | 24.06.1992 | ||
FR | 24.06.1992 | ||
GR | 24.06.1992 | ||
IT | 24.06.1992 | ||
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 24.06.1992 | |
BE | 24.06.1992 | ||
CH | 24.06.1992 | ||
DK | 24.06.1992 | ||
ES | 24.06.1992 | ||
GR | 24.06.1992 | ||
IT | 24.06.1992 | ||
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
FR | 13.11.1992 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 24.06.1992 | |
BE | 24.06.1992 | ||
CH | 24.06.1992 | ||
DK | 24.06.1992 | ||
GR | 24.06.1992 | ||
IT | 24.06.1992 | ||
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
FR | 13.11.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 24.06.1992 | |
BE | 24.06.1992 | ||
CH | 24.06.1992 | ||
DK | 24.06.1992 | ||
IT | 24.06.1992 | ||
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
FR | 13.11.1992 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 24.06.1992 | |
BE | 24.06.1992 | ||
CH | 24.06.1992 | ||
DK | 24.06.1992 | ||
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
FR | 13.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/22] | AT | 24.06.1992 | |
BE | 24.06.1992 | ||
CH | 24.06.1992 | ||
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
FR | 13.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 24.06.1992 | |
BE | 24.06.1992 | ||
CH | 24.06.1992 | ||
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 24.06.1992 | |
CH | 24.06.1992 | ||
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | CH | 24.06.1992 | |
LI | 24.06.1992 | ||
SE | 24.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | CH | 24.06.1992 | |
LI | 24.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR29768E ; | [AD]NL8400320 (ELTEN TECH ONTWICKEL BV) |