EP0395180 - A mowing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van der Lely, Cornelis 7, Brüschenrain Zug. / CH | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 90201062.8 | 27.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | NL19890001072 | 28.04.1989 Original published format: NL 8901072 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0395180 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395180 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/66 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
A01D34/665 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/44] | Title | German: | Mähmaschine | [1990/44] | English: | A mowing machine | [1990/44] | French: | Faucheuse | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0235850 ; | [X]EP0304584 ; | [A]EP0267659 ; | [A]EP0086171 ; | [A]DE2007716 ; | [A]US2625784 ; | [A]NL7605371 ; | [A]NL7804724 ; | [A]NL8403316 ; | [A]EP0260750 |