EP0405653 - Electric energy power converter of which commutation is aided by an active control of the supplying voltage of the voltage inverter circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fratta, Antonino, Dr.Ing. Via Le Chiuse 99 I-10144 Torino / IT | [1991/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Patrito, Pier Franco Cabinet PATRITO BREVETTI Via Don Minzoni 14 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Patrito, Pier Franco, Dr. Ing. Cabinet PATRITO BREVETTI Via Don Minzoni 14 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90201597.3 | 19.06.1990 | [1991/01] | Priority number, date | IT19890067519 | 27.06.1989 Original published format: IT 6751989 | [1991/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0405653 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0405653 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0405653 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387, H02M5/458, H02M7/515, H02M5/45 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
H02M5/45 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/01] | H02M7/5387, H02M5/45 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/01] | Title | German: | Elektrische Energie-Leistungskonverter, deren Kommutierung durch eine aktive Steuerung der Versorgungsspannung der Spannungsumpolschaltung unterstützt wird | [1991/01] | English: | Electric energy power converter of which commutation is aided by an active control of the supplying voltage of the voltage inverter circuit | [1991/01] | French: | Convertisseur de puissance d'énergie électrique dont la commutation est assistée moyennant un contrôle actif de la tension d'alimentation du circuit inverseur de tension | [1991/01] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2937078 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]DE3347108 (GARBE LAHMEYER & CO AG [DE]); | [A]US4730242 (DIVAN DEEPAKRAJ M [US]); | [A]EP0289373 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) |