EP0404262 - Monoepoxide-polyol adducts, and process for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andre, Olivier Louis Pierre Avenue Jean Monnet 1 B-1348 Ottignies-louvain-la-Neuve / BE | 02 /
Scholten, Henricus Paulus Hubertus Avenue Jean Monnet 1 B-1348 Ottignies-louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1991/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1990/52] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 90201606.2 | 19.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | GB19890014161 | 20.06.1989 Original published format: GB 8914161 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0404262 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0404262 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/28, C09D171/02 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
C09D171/02 (EP,US);
C08G65/2606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Monoepoxidpolyol-Addukten | [1990/52] | English: | Monoepoxide-polyol adducts, and process for preparing the same | [1990/52] | French: | Produits d'addition de monoépoxyde-polyols et leur procédé de préparation | [1990/52] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/17] | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD203734 ; | [X]FR2322840 (BEROL KEMI AB [SE]); | [X]US4359589 (BROWNSCOMBE THOMAS F); | [YD]EP0244897 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [X]FR2626579 (BP CHIMIE SA [FR]) |