EP0421502 - Process for the preparation of a catalyst or catalyst precursor suitable for the preparation of hydrocarbons from carbon monoxide and hydrogen, and said catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.1995 [1995/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinalda, Donald Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Kars, Jelte Vondelingenweg 601 NL-3196 KK Rotterdam / NL | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/01] |
Former [1991/34] | Spierenburg, Jan, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Patents, Licensing & Trade Marks Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1991/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1991/15] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202215.1 | 15.08.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | GB19890018845 | 18.08.1989 Original published format: GB 8918845 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0421502 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0421502 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421502 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/74, C07C1/04 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (US);
B01J35/77 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP,US);
C07C1/0435 (EP,US);
C07C1/0445 (EP,US);
B01J37/0207 (EP,US);
C07C2521/04 (EP,US);
C07C2521/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/15] | Title | German: | Katalysator oder Katalysatorvorläufer zur Herstellung von Kohlenwasserstoffen aus Wasserstoff und Kohlenmonoxyd und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [1991/15] | English: | Process for the preparation of a catalyst or catalyst precursor suitable for the preparation of hydrocarbons from carbon monoxide and hydrogen, and said catalyst | [1991/15] | French: | Catalyseur ou précurseur de catalyseur pour la préparation d'hydrocarbures à partir du monoxyde de carbone et d'hydrogène et procédé pour le produire | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2231641 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US4613624 (BEUTHER HAROLD [US], et al); | [A]EP0253924 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]EP0307239 (PRATLEY INVESTMENTS [ZA]) |