EP0472782 - Method of localizing an extreme amplitude value in multivalued amplitude data field and apparatus for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.1993 [1993/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nijholt, Geert c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Bernsen, Johannes Arnoldus Cornelis c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202279.7 | 27.08.1990 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472782 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/68 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
G06T7/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Bestimmung einer Extremwertamplitude in einem Datafeld mit mehreren Werten | [1992/10] | English: | Method of localizing an extreme amplitude value in multivalued amplitude data field and apparatus for performing the method | [1992/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la localisation d'une valeur extrême d'amplitude dans un champ de données à niveaux multiples | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 09.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/22] | 06.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.10.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0279297 ; | [A]JPS60201484 | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. ASSP-35, no. 5, May 1987pages 680-695; Y.H. LEE et al.: "An edge gradient enhancing adaptive order statistic filter" | [A] - OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 27, no. 10, October 1988pages 854-860; J.A. SAGHRI et al.: "Feature-based image bandwidth compression" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 57 (P-434)[2114]7th March 1986; & JP-A-60 201 484 (FUJITSU) 11-10-1985 |