EP0420311 - Preparation of quaternary ammonium hydroxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rijkhof, Evert Jan Joh. Poststraat 37 NL-3762 VL Soest / NL | 02 /
Tholen, Johannes Petrus Paulus Prins Mauritslaan 9 NL-1405 CS Bussum / NL | 03 /
Van der Maas, Hendricus Johannus Hubert Hagenland 25A NL-5321 HD Hedel / NL | 04 /
Boxhoorn, Gosse Nieuwsteeg 21 NL-4196 AK Tricht / NL | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1994/16] |
Former [1991/34] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1991/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1991/14] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202300.1 | 27.08.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | GB19890019682 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: GB 8919682 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0420311 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420311 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C25B3/00 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
C25B3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Herstellung von quartären Ammoniumhydroxyden | [1991/14] | English: | Preparation of quaternary ammonium hydroxides | [1991/14] | French: | Préparation d'hydroxydes d'ammonium quaternaire | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.1994 | SE | 20.04.1994 | [2002/23] |
Former [1995/02] | AT | 20.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP162488 ; | [A]JP6324080 ; | [AD]EP0127201 (ENICHIMICA SPA [IT]); | [AD]EP0255756 (SACHEM INC [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 260 (C-607)[3608], 15th June 1989; & JP-A-1 62 488 (DAIWA KASEI KENKYUSHO K.K.) 08-03-1989, & JP162488 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 230 (C-508)[3077], 29th June 1988; & JP-A-63 24 080 (TAMA KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 01-02-1988, & JP6324080 A 00000000 |