EP0436970 - Double perovskite catalysts for oxidative coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Kenneth Dwight 101 Bowhunter Road Charleston, West Virginia 25314 / US | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202470.2 | 18.09.1990 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | US19900463320 | 10.01.1990 Original published format: US 463320 | [1991/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0436970 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/84, B01J23/78 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
C07C2/84 (EP,US);
C07C2523/04 (EP,US);
C07C2523/10 (EP,US);
C07C2523/34 (EP,US);
C07C2523/75 (EP,US);
Y10S585/943 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/29] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Dobbelperovskiten als Katalysatoren in oxydativen Kupplungsverfahren | [1991/29] | English: | Double perovskite catalysts for oxidative coupling | [1991/29] | French: | Doubles pérovskites comme catalyseurs de procédés de couplage oxydatif | [1991/29] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/18] | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2192894 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO); | [AD]US4654459 (SOFRANKO JOHN A [US]) |