EP0420359 - Transport vehicle with container unloading device provided with weighing means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERBERG MACHINES B.V. Industrieweg 10 NL-3402 MB IJsselstein / NL | [1991/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Versteeg, Jan Hendrik No. 21 Fazantstraat 21 NL-4043 NK Opheusden / NL | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1991/14] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202567.5 | 27.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | NL19890002432 | 29.09.1989 Original published format: NL 8902432 | [1991/14] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0420359 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420359 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65F3/04 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
B65F3/08 (EP);
B65F2003/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, LU, NL [1991/14] | Title | German: | Transportfahrzeug mit Behälterentladevorrichtung, ausgestattet mit einer Wiegevorrichtung | [1991/14] | English: | Transport vehicle with container unloading device provided with weighing means | [1991/14] | French: | Véhicule de transport équipé d'un dispositif de décharge de récipients pourvu de moyens de pesage | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.1992 | 30.09.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE9707422U [ ]; | EP0186820 [ ]; | DE8619532U [ ] | Examination | DE8707422U |