EP0422713 - Edible spread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1991/16] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Havenstein, Alfred Gustav Baumschulenweg 12 D-2000 Schenefeld / DE | 02 /
Huffziger, Axel Eberhofsteig 3b D-2000 Hamburg 62 / DE | [1992/33] |
Former [1991/16] | 01 /
Gabriel, Gerhard Pattenserhauptstrasse 8 D-2090 Binsen / DE | ||
02 /
Havenstein, Maria Baumschulenweg 12 D-2000 Schenefeld / DE | |||
03 /
Holemans, Pieter Maria Jozef Schapendreef 3 B-2080 Kapellen / BE | |||
04 /
Huffziger, Axel Eberhofsteig 3b D-2000 Hamburg 62 / DE | Representative(s) | Keppels, Willem R.E.G., et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O.Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Keppels, Willem Richard Engelbertus Gerardus, Drs., et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O.Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1991/16] | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, Dr. UNILEVER N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202571.7 | 28.09.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | GB19890022718 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: GB 8922718 | GB19900004615 | 01.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9004615 | GB19900010131 | 04.05.1990 Original published format: GB 9010131 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0422713 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0422713 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422713 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/00 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
A23D9/02 (EP);
A23D7/013 (EP);
A23D7/015 (EP);
A23D7/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | Essbarer Aufstrich | [1991/16] | English: | Edible spread | [1991/16] | French: | Matière à tartiner comestible | [1991/16] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 24.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.11.1994 | CH | 09.11.1994 | ES | 09.11.1994 | GR | 09.11.1994 | IT | 09.11.1994 | LI | 09.11.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 09.11.1994 | |
CH | 09.11.1994 | ||
GR | 09.11.1994 | ||
IT | 09.11.1994 | ||
LI | 09.11.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 09.11.1994 | |
CH | 09.11.1994 | ||
IT | 09.11.1994 | ||
LI | 09.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | AT | 09.11.1994 | |
CH | 09.11.1994 | ||
LI | 09.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 09.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1113241 (UNILEVER LTD); | [Y]US3457086 (JOSEFOWICZ EDMUND L, et al); | [A]US4425370 (GRAVES FREDERIC A [US]); | [X]EP0151450 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0157954 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [A]EP0203628 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [X]EP0253429 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [Y]EP0279498 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [Y]EP0279499 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0297690 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [Y]EP0304131 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) | [ ] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, AN=84-144091 [23], DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD, LONDON, GB; | [ ] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19840510), vol. 241, no. 052 |