Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6375490 | Global Dossier | 11.04.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8922477 | 05.10.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6302494 | Global Dossier | 21.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8922477 | 05.10.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0421538 | Global Dossier | 10.04.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8922477 | 05.10.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8922477D0 | 22.11.1989 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8922477 | 05.10.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH03212397 | 17.09.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8922477 | 05.10.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR910007767 | 30.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8922477 | 05.10.1989 |