EP0428214 - Electrophotographic recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terrell, David Richard Diependaele 4 B - 2547 Lint / BE | 02 /
De Meutter, Stefaan Karel Schildebaan 22 B - 2240 Zandhoven / BE | 03 /
Kaletta, Bernd Heymannstr. 40 D - 5090 Leverkusen / DE | [1991/21] | Application number, filing date | 90202953.7 | 08.11.1990 | [1991/21] | Priority number, date | EP19890121024 | 13.11.1989 Original published format: EP 89121024 | [1991/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428214 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428214 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/06 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
G03G5/0696 (EP);
C09B47/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/21] | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1991/21] | English: | Electrophotographic recording material | [1991/21] | French: | Matériau d'enregistrement électrophotographique | [1991/21] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.03.1995 | NL | 29.03.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2000/27] | BE | 29.03.1995 | |
NL | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 29.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6261981 ; | [A]JP63106662 ; | [A]FR2379841 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 262 (C-442)(2709) 25 August 1987, & JP-A-62 61981 (MITSUBISHI) 18 March 1987,, & JP6261981 A 19870318 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 354 (P-761)(3201) 22 September 1988, & JP-A-63 106662 (FUJI) 11 May 1988,, & JP63106662 A 19880511 |