EP0431674 - Control device and method for needle-by-needle selection in a circular knitting machine by remote transmission with rotary electromagnetic actuators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAVIO S.p.A. Via Udine 105 33170 Pordenone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states SAVIO S.p.A. Via Udine 105 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandani, Paolo Via Pistelli 9 I-50018 Scandicci, Florence / IT | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/46] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1991/24] | Henke, Erwin Ing.Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90203117.8 | 24.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | IT19890022566 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: IT 2256689 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0431674 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/66 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
D04B15/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/24] | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung und Verfahren zur Nadelauswahl an eine Rundstrickmaschine durch drahtlose Übermittlung mit drehbaren elektromagnetischen Stellgliedern | [1991/24] | English: | Control device and method for needle-by-needle selection in a circular knitting machine by remote transmission with rotary electromagnetic actuators | [1991/24] | French: | Dispositif de commande et procédé pour la sélection d'aiguilles à un métier à tricoter circulaire par transmission à distance par organes de positionnement rotatives électro-magnétiques | [1991/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 20.01.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3760610 (HADAM W, et al); | [A]DE2540498 (WILDT MELLOR BROMLEY LTD); | [A]US4081974 (JAFFE WOLFGANG, et al); | [A]GB2194970 (STOLL & CO H) | [A] - Electronics Week vol. 58, no. 17, 29 avril 1985, New York, USA pages 59 - 61; "Improved Hall devices find new uses." |