04.07.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
30.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
26.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
08.08.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
08.08.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
30.05.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] |
23.05.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] |
16.08.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] |
10.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.03.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.12.1995 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.08.1994 |
First examination report |
|
09.01.1993 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] |
12.10.1992 |
Change - name/address |
published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] |
15.10.1991 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] |
18.09.1991 |
Publication of search report |
published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] |
09.05.1991 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] |