Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6810490 | Global Dossier | 27.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | EP89203310 | 21.12.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0434117 | Global Dossier | 02.10.1996 | B1 | EP0434117 | 06.11.1991 | A3 | EP0434117 | 26.06.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP89203310 | 21.12.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE143664T | 15.10.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP89203310 | 21.12.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2032678 | 22.06.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP89203310 | 21.12.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69028759T | 20.02.1997 | T2 | DE69028759D1 | 07.11.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP89203310 | 21.12.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0421655 | 24.01.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | EP89203310 | 21.12.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5250155 | 05.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP89203310 | 21.12.1989 |