EP0434117 - Process for refining soapcontaining crude polyol fatty-acid polyester reaction products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1991/26] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zwanenburg, Arend Unilever Research Lab., Olivier van Noortlaan 120 Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
Barmentlo, Bart Unilever Research Lab., Olivier van Noortlaan 120 Vlaardingen / NL | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, Dr., et al UNILEVER N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 90203228.3 | 07.12.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | EP19890203310 | 21.12.1989 Original published format: EP 89203310 | [1991/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0434117 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0434117 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434117 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07H13/06 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
C07H13/06 (EP,US);
Y10S203/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Raffinierung von Seife enthaltendem Rohprodukt aus einem Polyol-Fettsäure-Veresterungsgemisch | [1991/26] | English: | Process for refining soapcontaining crude polyol fatty-acid polyester reaction products | [1991/26] | French: | Procédé pour raffiner le produit brut de production de polyesters de polyols et acides gras, contenant du savon | [1991/26] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 16.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.10.1996 | BE | 02.10.1996 | CH | 02.10.1996 | DK | 02.10.1996 | ES | 02.10.1996 | GR | 02.10.1996 | IT | 02.10.1996 | LI | 02.10.1996 | SE | 02.01.1997 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
ES | 02.10.1996 | ||
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
CH | 07.01.1997 | ||
LI | 07.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 02.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2831854 (TUCKER NATHANIEL B, et al); | [A]US3714144 (FEUGE R, et al); | [A]GB2061941 (ETHYL CORP); | [A]GB2081266 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD); | [A]EP0065390 (TATE & LYLE PLC [GB]); | [A]GB2161806 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD); | [XPD]EP0319092 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) |