EP0491088 - Rotary hook for sewing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HIROSE MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED 10-32 Sanmeicho 2-chome Abeno-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states HIROSE MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED 10-32 Sanmeicho 2-chome Abeno-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Tokuzo 13-13, Higashiyama-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 90203367.9 | 17.12.1990 | [1992/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491088 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D05B57/14 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
D05B57/143 (EP,US);
D05D2209/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/26] | Title | German: | Umlaufender Greifer für Nähmaschine | [1992/26] | English: | Rotary hook for sewing machines | [1992/26] | French: | Crochet rotatif de machine à coudre | [1992/26] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/36] | 03.11.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/36] | Appeal following examination | 22.12.1997 | Appeal received No. T1047/98 | 30.01.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.01.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 30.01.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 11.07.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0090544 (HIROSE MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US3140681 (COREY ROBERT J); | [X]US4660487 (MIKUNI YOSHIO [JP]); | [X]US3223060 (COREY ROBERT J); | [A]US2102954 (HOHMANN RICHARD K) |