EP0435395 - Hierarchical synchronization method for the nodes of a telecommunication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernert, Jan-Paul, Dr. Gibitzenhofstrasse 58 W-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Tergau, Dietrich, et al Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB Längenstrasse 14 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Tergau, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1991/27] | Peuckert, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90203399.2 | 18.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | DE19893943052 | 28.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3943052 | [1991/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435395 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435395 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435395 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
H04J3/0679 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | Hierarchisches Synchronisationsverfahren für Vermittlungsstellen eines Fernmeldenetzes | [1991/27] | English: | Hierarchical synchronization method for the nodes of a telecommunication network | [1991/27] | French: | Méthode hiérarchique de synchronisation pour les point de commutation d'un reseau de télécommunications | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2986723 (DARWIN GEORGE P, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN Bd. 25, Nr. 11B, April 1983, ARMONK US Seiten 6293 - 6298 L. S. ROGERS 'CLOCK SOURCE SELCTION METHOD IN DISTRIBUTED COMMUNICATION NETWORKS' |