EP0391508 - Utility water plant disinfecting process. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/41] | Circulating utility water disinfecting process and plant | ||
[1994/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
GR
IT
LU
SE
Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. Berghauser Strasse 40 Postfach 10 10 61 42810 Remscheid / DE | For:BE
n.v. Vaillant s.a. rue Golden Hopestraat 15 1620 Drogenbos / BE | For:FR
VAILLANT S.A.R.L 4, Rue des Oliviers Orly-Sénia 326 94537 Rungis Cedex / FR | For:AT
VAILLANT Ges.m.b.H Forchheimergasse 7 Postfach 56 1233 Wien / AT | For:GB
Vaillant Ltd. Vaillant House Medway City Estate Trident Close Rochester Kent ME2 4EZ / GB | For:NL
Vaillant B.V. Paasheuvelweg 42 Postbus 23250 1105 BJ Amsterdam / NL | For:CH
LI
Vaillant GmbH Riedstrasse 8 8953 Dietikon 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For:DE
ES
GR
IT
LU
SE
Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. Berghauser Strasse 40 Postfach 10 10 61 D-42810 Remscheid / DE | ||
For:BE
n.v. Vaillant s.a. rue Golden Hopestraat 15 B-1620 Drogenbos / BE | |||
For:FR
VAILLANT S.A.R.L 4, Rue des Oliviers Orly-Sénia 326 F-94537 Rungis Cedex / FR | |||
For:AT
VAILLANT Ges.m.b.H Forchheimergasse 7 Postfach 56 A-1233 Wien / AT | |||
For:GB
Vaillant Ltd. Vaillant House Medway City Estate Trident Close Rochester Kent ME2 4EZ / GB | |||
For:NL
Vaillant B.V. Paasheuvelweg 42 Postbus 23250 NL-1105 BJ Amsterdam / NL | |||
For:CH
LI
Vaillant GmbH Riedstrasse 8 CH-8953 Dietikon 1 / CH | |||
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. Berghauser Strasse 40 Postfach 10 10 61 D-42810 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bechem, Herbert Spieckerlinde 2 D-5600 Wuppertal 23 / DE | 02 /
Tenhumberg, Jürgen, Dr. Tuchstrasse 62 D-5608 Radevormwald / DE | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Heim, Johann-Ludwig C/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Postfach 10 10 20 42810 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Heim, Johann-Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Postfach 10 10 20 D-42810 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 90250082.6 | 26.03.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | AT19890000805 | 06.04.1989 Original published format: AT 80589 | AT19890000902 | 17.04.1989 Original published format: AT 90289 | [1990/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0391508 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0391508 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0391508 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/02, F24D19/10 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
F24D17/0078 (EP);
C02F1/02 (EP);
F24D17/0073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Desinfizieren einer Brauchwasseranlage. | [1994/02] | English: | Utility water plant disinfecting process. | [1994/02] | French: | Procédé pour désinfecter une installation d'eau de consommation. | [1994/02] |
Former [1990/41] | Verfahren zum Desinfizieren eines zirkulierenden Brauchwassers sowie Brauchwasseranlage zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | ||
Former [1990/41] | Circulating utility water disinfecting process and plant | ||
Former [1990/41] | Procédé et installation pour désinfecter l'eau de consommation en circuit | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.01.1994 | ES | 12.01.1994 | GR | 12.01.1994 | IT | 12.01.1994 | SE | 12.01.1994 | LU | 31.03.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | BE | 12.01.1994 | |
GR | 12.01.1994 | ||
IT | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
LU | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 12.01.1994 | |
IT | 12.01.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 12.01.1994 | |
SE | 12.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/44] | SE | 12.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2379033 (VAILLANT SA [FR]); | [X]DE3128359 (ZORTEA REMBERT); | [X]EP0059816 (FONDERIE SOC GEN DE [FR]); | [A]GB2146797 (FLUIDMASTER); | [A]DE3525990 (BUDERUS AG [DE]); | [X]EP0270993 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]); | [XP]DE8814968U ; | [AP]DE8903316U ; | [XP]WO8903807 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]); | [XP]WO9002707 (BEAUMONT UK LTD [GB]) |