EP0405704 - DTPA-complexes derivatives, pharmaceutical compositions containing them, their use and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitt-Willich, Heribert, Dr. Gardeschützenweg 102 D-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | 02 /
Platzek, Johannes, Dr. Clayallee 64 D-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | 03 /
Gries, Heinz, Dr. Helmstedter Strasse 19 D-1000 Berlin 31 / DE | 04 /
Schuhmann-Giampieri, Gabriele, Dr. Marschnerstrasse 34 D-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | 05 /
Vogler, Hubert, Dr. Dahlmannstrasse 10 D-1000 Berlin 12 / DE | 06 /
Weinmann, Hanns-Joachim, Dr. Westhofener Weg 23 D-1000 Berlin 38 / DE | [1991/01] | Application number, filing date | 90250165.9 | 27.06.1990 | [1991/01] | Priority number, date | DE19893922005 | 30.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3922005 | [1991/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0405704 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0405704 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0405704 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/04, C07C227/18, A61K31/195, A61K49/00 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
A61K49/06 (EP);
C07C229/04 (KR);
C07C229/16 (EP);
C07F15/025 (EP);
C07F5/003 (EP);
C07F9/94 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/01] | C07C229/04, C07C227/18, A61K31/195 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/01] | Title | German: | Derivatisierte DTPA-Komplexe, diese Verbindungen enthaltende pharmazeutische Mittel, ihre Verwendung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1991/01] | English: | DTPA-complexes derivatives, pharmaceutical compositions containing them, their use and process for their preparation | [1991/01] | French: | Dérivés de DTPA-complèxes, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant, leur utilisation et procédé pour leur fabrication | [1991/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3401052 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [X]EP0165716 (MICROMEDIC SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]EP0263059 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [X]WO8807521 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [X]EP0299795 (NYCOMED AS [NO]); | [X]EP0305320 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [X]EP0315220 (GANSOW OTTO A) |