EP0406994 - A composite coal gasification power plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/02] | A composite coal gasfication power plant | ||
[1993/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Kiitiro, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Miyake, Junsuke, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Oosawa, Yasuko, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1991/02] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 90250170.9 | 04.07.1990 | [1991/02] | Priority number, date | JP19890173042 | 06.07.1989 Original published format: JP 17304289 | [1991/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0406994 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0406994 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/00, F02C3/28, F01K23/06 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
C10J3/00 (EP);
C10J3/86 (EP);
C10K1/00 (EP);
F01K23/067 (EP);
F02C3/28 (EP);
C10J2300/093 (EP);
C10J2300/1675 (EP);
C10J2300/1687 (EP);
C10J2300/1884 (EP);
C10J2300/1892 (EP);
Y02E20/18 (EP);
Y02P20/10 (EP);
Y02P20/129 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1991/02] | Title | German: | Zusammengesetztes Kohlenvergasungskraftwerk | [1991/02] | English: | A composite coal gasification power plant | [1993/51] | French: | Centrale électrique à charbon composée | [1991/02] |
Former [1991/02] | A composite coal gasfication power plant | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE947843 (HENSCHEL & SOHN GMBH); | [Y]EP0334833 (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT]); | [A]DE2924245 (RHEINISCHE BRAUNKOHLENW AG); | [A]DE3609237 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US4831817 (LINHARDT HANS D [US]) |