blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0471115

EP0471115 - Method and device for fabricating bar-shaped metallic products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.1994
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.1994Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.03.1994 [1994/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 10 36 41
40027 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/08]For all designated states
MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 10 36 41
D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Niggemann, Theodor
Gartenstrasse 72
D-4500 Osnabrück / DE
[1992/08]
Representative(s)Meissner, Peter E., et al
Meissner & Meissner
Patentanwaltsbüro
Postfach 33 01 30
14171 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/09]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30
D-14171 Berlin / DE
Former [1992/08]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro
Postfach
D-14199 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date90250207.916.08.1990
[1992/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0471115
Date:19.02.1992
Language:DE
[1992/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:B21B21/00, B21B35/12
[1992/08]
CPC:
F16H55/28 (EP); B21B21/005 (EP); B21B35/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1992/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von strangförmigem metallischen Gut[1992/08]
English:Method and device for fabricating bar-shaped metallic products[1992/08]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication des produits métalliques en forme de barres[1992/08]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure03.06.1991Examination requested  [1992/08]
07.05.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.05.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.11.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.1994Application withdrawn by applicant  [1994/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[E]DE3905244  ;
 [Y]DE1287541  ;
 [Y]FR2525785  ;
 [A]DE2245721  ;
 [A]DE2232803  ;
 [A]FR439366  ;
 [A]US2548603
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.