Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] |
12.02.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] |
09.01.1993 | Change - representative | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] |
13.05.1992 | First examination report | |
04.04.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.1991 [1991/21] |
19.02.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] |
26.01.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] |