EP0426265 - Solid electrolyte fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irino, Mitsuhiro, c/o Takasago Technical Inst. Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome Arai-machi, Takasago, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 02 /
Gora, Tetsuo, c/o Takasago Technical Inst. Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome Arai-machi, Takasago, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 03 /
Minami, Masaharu, c/o Takasago Technical Inst. Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome Arai-machi, Takasago, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 04 /
Miyamoto, Hitoshi, c/o Takasago Technical Inst. Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome Arai-machi, Takasago, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 05 /
Sumi, Masao, c/o Takasago Technical Inst. Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome Arai-machi, Takasago, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 06 /
Tomita, Nobugoshi A403, 3781-26, Higashiyama-Nishiyama Ohkuradani, Akashi Hyogo Pref. 673 / JP | 07 /
Watanabe, Kiyoshi, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 08 /
Ogura, Kazumi, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 09 /
Nishiura, Masanori, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 10 /
Funatsu, Masayuki, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 11 /
Yoshimoto, Kazuhiro, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 12 /
Takenobu, Koichi, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe, Hyogo Pref. / JP | 13 /
Satake, Tokuki, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe, Hyogo Pref. / JP | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1991/19] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 90250227.7 | 07.09.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | JP19890236459 | 12.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23645989 | JP19890294483 | 13.11.1989 Original published format: JP 29448389 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0426265 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0426265 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426265 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24, H01M8/02, H01M8/12 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
H01M8/0271 (EP,US);
H01M8/1213 (EP,US);
H01M8/242 (US);
H01M8/2432 (EP);
H01M4/9033 (EP,US);
H01M4/9066 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/19] | Title | German: | Brennstoffzelle mit festen Elektrolyten | [1991/19] | English: | Solid electrolyte fuel cell | [1991/19] | French: | Pile à combustible à électrolyte solide | [1991/19] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP1041172 [ ]; | JP62184772 [ ]; | JP63245867 [ ]; | JP62076262 [ ]; | JP62131479 [ ]; | JP62133677 [ ]; | JP1197971 [ ]; | JP1206567 [ ]; | JP1227362 [ ]; | [A]EP0289226 (STANDARD OIL CO OHIO [US]); | [XP]EP0338823 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK [JP]); | [XP]EP0355420 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [X]DE2747467 ; | [A]FR2294244 (KENT LTD G [GB]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 235 (E-766)[3583], 30th May 1989; & JP,A,1 041 172 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND. LTD) 13-02-1989, abstract., & JP1041172 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 26 (E-577)[2873], 26th January 1988; & JP,A,62 184 772 (MITSUBISI ELECTRIC CORP.) 13-08-1987, abstract., & JP62184772 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 53 (E-713)[3401], 7th Febuary 1989; & JP,A,63 245 867 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 12-10-1988, abstract., & JP63245867 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 275 (E-537)[2722], 5th September 1987; & JP,A,62 076 262 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 12-10-1988, abstract., & JP62076262 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 355 (E-558)[2802], 19th November 1987; & JP,A,62 131 479 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 13-06-1987, abstract., & JP62131479 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 359 (E.559)[2806], 21st November 1987; & JP,A,62 133 677 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO., LTD) 16-06-1987, abstract., & JP62133677 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 493 (E-842)[3841], 8th November 1989; & JP,A,1 197 971 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND. LTD) 09-08-1989, abstract., & JP1197971 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 509 (E-846)[3857], 15th November 1989; & JP,A,1 206 567 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND. LTD) 18-08-1989, abstract., & JP1206567 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 548 (E-856)[3896], 7th December 1989; & JP,A,1 227 362 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND.) 11-09-1989, abstract., & JP1227362 A 00000000 |